Company Name | Designation | Appointed on | DSC | Status |
---|---|---|---|---|
AMAV BROTHERS PVT. LTD. | Director | 25 Jun, 1986 | Yes | Active |
AREN STEEL PVT LTD | Director | 21 Feb, 1989 | Yes | Active |
AREN STRIPS PVT LTD | Director | 19 Feb, 2010 | Yes | Active |
EUREKA WIRES LTD | Director | 10 Mar, 2006 | Expired | Active |
WWI WIRES INDUSTRIES PVT LTD | Director | 13 Sep, 1991 | Yes | Resigned |
RAKESH LAMINATING CO PVT LTD | Director | 23 Feb, 2010 | Yes | Active |
PANORMA STEEL PRODUCTS PVT LTD | Director | 04 Jan, 2016 | - | Active |
L S ASSOCIATES PVT LTD | Director | 04 Jan, 2016 | - | Active |
Follow @corporatedir | ||||