Company Name | Designation | Appointed on | DSC | Status |
---|---|---|---|---|
AMAV BROTHERS PVT. LTD. | Director | 25 Jun, 1986 | Yes | Active |
AREN STRIPS PVT LTD | Director | 25 Jun, 2006 | Yes | Active |
EUREKA WIRES LTD | Director | 10 Mar, 2006 | Expired | Active |
L S ASSOCIATES PVT LTD | Director | 18 Sep, 1985 | Expired | Active |
SAGAR COMMERCIAL PVT LTD | Director | 20 Jun, 2006 | Expired | Active |
MARSHAL STEEL CORPORATION PVT.LTD. | Director | 25 Jan, 2007 | Expired | Resigned |
WWI WIRES INDUSTRIES PVT LTD | Director | 13 Sep, 1991 | Yes | Resigned |
RAKESH LAMINATING CO PVT LTD | Director | 25 Jul, 1980 | Yes | Active |
PANORMA STEEL PRODUCTS PVT LTD | Director | 16 Jun, 1987 | - | Active |
AREN STEEL PVT LTD | Director | 03 Jan, 2016 | - | Active |
Follow @corporatedir | ||||