Company Name | Designation | Appointed on | DSC | Status |
---|---|---|---|---|
DHRS SOFTWARE SOLUTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED | Director | 10 Apr, 2010 | No | Active |
AKSHARAARKA ENTERPRISE PRIVATE LIMITED | Director | 02 Sep, 2016 | - | Resigned |
ELDAAS TECHNOLOGIES PRIVATE LIMITED | Director | 12 Oct, 2015 | - | Active |
DHRS SOFTWARE SOLUTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED | Director | 10 Apr, 2010 | - | Active |
MPART TECHNOLOGIES PRIVATE LIMITED | Director | 25 Jul, 2019 | - | Active |
Follow @corporatedir | ||||