Company Name | Designation | Appointed on | DSC | Status |
---|---|---|---|---|
PRATIBHA BEVERAGES PRIVATE LIMITED | Director | 18 Jun, 2010 | No | Active |
PRATIBHA SKYSCRAPERS PRIVATE LIMITED | Director | 29 Nov, 2010 | No | Resigned |
RK POULTRIES PRIVATE LIMITED | Director | 21 Dec, 2015 | - | Active |
LANDLORD LANDMARK PRIVATE LIMITED | Director | 28 Mar, 2016 | - | Active |
NANDINI NUTRITION PRODUCTS LLP | Director | - | - | Active |
MEAT KING PRIVATE LIMITED | Director | 14 May, 2018 | - | Active |
VISHWESHWARA HATCHERIES PRIVATE LIMITED | Individual Promoter | - | - | Resigned |
GREENCON PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED | Director | 26 Mar, 2016 | - | Active |
KRISHNAI NOURISHMENT PRODUCTS LLP | Director | - | - | Active |
Follow @corporatedir | ||||