Company Name | Designation | Appointed on | DSC | Status |
---|---|---|---|---|
ABHIYAN MEDIA PRIVATE LIMITED | Director | 02 Jan, 2012 | Yes | Active |
BHAYAJI MERCANTILE PRIVATE LIMITED | Director | 15 Jan, 2010 | Yes | Resigned |
HOTHAAT MARKETPLACE PRIVATE LIMITED | Director | 29 Oct, 2012 | Yes | Active |
ZHAI CONSTRUCTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED | Director | 10 Dec, 2007 | Yes | Resigned |
SPLENDID UDYOG LIMITED | Director | - | - | Active |
ALPHA CROSS BORDER ECOMMERCE SOLUTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED | Director | 05 Sep, 2018 | - | Active |
SHIPCUBE SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED | Individual Promoter | - | - | Active |
Follow @corporatedir | ||||