Company Name | Designation | Appointed on | DSC | Status |
---|---|---|---|---|
ARTESANA RETAIL PRIVATE LIMITED | Director | 13 Mar, 2012 | Yes | Active |
BOLLYWOOD TOURISM PRIVATE LIMITED | Director | - | Yes | Resigned |
WELBURN RETAIL PRIVATE LIMITED | Director | 19 Feb, 2010 | Yes | Active |
WELBURN CANDLES PRIVATE LIMITED | Director | 06 Mar, 2006 | Yes | Active |
WELBUILD PROMOTERS PRIVATE LIMITED | Director | 06 Jun, 2011 | Yes | Active |
Follow @corporatedir | ||||