Company Name | Designation | Appointed on | DSC | Status |
---|---|---|---|---|
JWALASAGAR INDUSTRIES PRIVATE LIMITED | Additional Director | 11 Jan, 2008 | No | Resigned |
ELEKTROMAG DEVICES PRIVATE LIMITED | Director | 15 Jul, 1974 | No | Resigned |
UNIQUE ELECTROMAG METHODS PVT LTD | Director | 14 Nov, 1983 | No | Resigned |
GUJARAT ELEKTROMAG INDUSTRIES PRIVATE LIMITED | Director | 30 Aug, 1982 | - | Resigned |
Follow @corporatedir | ||||