Company Name | Designation | Appointed on | DSC | Status |
---|---|---|---|---|
KUNTAL INVESTMENTS LIMITED | Director | 11 Sep, 2004 | Expired | Active |
KUNTAL INVESTMENTS LIMITED | Director | - | Expired | Active |
SOUTH ASIA FINANCE LIMITED | Director | 09 Sep, 2004 | - | Active |
KUMAR'S ENERGY CORPORATION LIMITED | Director | 11 Sep, 2004 | - | Active |
KUMAR'S IRON AND STEEL CORPORATION LIMITED | Director | 10 Sep, 2004 | - | Active |
KUMAR'S SPIRITS PRIVATE LIMITED | Director | 25 Jun, 2004 | - | Resigned |
KUMAR'S GRANITE AND STONE INDUSTRIES LIMITED | Director | 11 Sep, 2004 | - | Active |
SOUTH ASIA FINANCE LIMITED | Director | 09 Sep, 2004 | - | Active |
Follow @corporatedir | ||||