Company Name | Designation | Appointed on | DSC | Status |
---|---|---|---|---|
COLBY DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED | Director | 05 May, 2003 | Yes | Resigned |
BENTLEY FARMS PRIVATE LIMITED | Director | 05 May, 2003 | Yes | Active |
UNITED TRAVELS PRIVATE LIMITED | Director | 28 Jul, 1997 | Yes | Active |
HAJEE MOOSA ASSOCIATES PRIVATE LIMITED | Director | - | - | Resigned |
HAMPTON PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED | Director | - | - | Resigned |
HAJEE MOOSA HOTELS PRIVATE LTD | Director | 26 May, 2003 | - | Resigned |
HAJEE MOOSA ENTERPRISES PRIVATE LIMITED | Director | 30 Sep, 2003 | - | Resigned |
COLBY FARMS PRIVATE LIMITED | Director | 31 Dec, 2012 | - | Resigned |
Follow @corporatedir | ||||