Company Name | Designation | Appointed on | DSC | Status |
---|---|---|---|---|
MODEX TRADING PRIVATE LIMITED | Director | - | Yes | Resigned |
LIL-HAM ESTATE ENTERPRISES PRIVATE LIMITED | Director | 18 Dec, 2003 | Yes | Active |
TEAM INTERIORS PRIVATE LIMITED | Director | 21 Apr, 2011 | Yes | Active |
IMAGINA SOURCING PRIVATE LIMITED | Director | 10 Jun, 2011 | - | Resigned |
PROMOD INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED | Director | 17 May, 2013 | - | Resigned |
Follow @corporatedir | ||||